ND HB1400 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 15-01-02 and subsection 3 of section 21-10-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to investment of the common schools trust fund.
Title
Investment of the common schools trust fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Eric Murphy [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Olson [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 80 |
2023-01-31 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:51 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |