ND HB1399 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 51
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 51
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 43-07-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contractor license requirements; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Contractor license requirements; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 43 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 51 |
2017-01-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |