ND HB1397 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 093
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 093
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Potter, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 10-04-02, 26.1-33.3-01, 26.1-33.3-02, 26.1-33.3-03, 26.1-33.3-04, 26.1-33.3-05, 26.1-33.3-06, 26.1-33.3-07, 26.1-33.3-08, 26.1-33.3-09, 26.1-33.3-10, 26.1-33.3-11, 26.1-33.3-12, 26.1-33.3-13, 26.1-33.3-14, 26.1-33.3-15, 26.1-33.3-16, and 26.1-33.3-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions to viatical settlement law and references to the viatical settlement law; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Potter, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 10-04-02, 26.1-33.3-01, 26.1-33.3-02, 26.1-33.3-03, 26.1-33.3-04, 26.1-33.3-05, 26.1-33.3-06, 26.1-33.3-07, 26.1-33.3-08, 26.1-33.3-09, 26.1-33.3-10, 26.1-33.3-11, 26.1-33.3-12, 26.1-33.3-13, 26.1-33.3-14, 26.1-33.3-15, 26.1-33.3-16, and 26.1-33.3-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to revisions to viatical settlement law and references to the viatical settlement law; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-19 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 093 | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-02-02 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1397.html |