ND HB1371 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for renters of residential property; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An income tax credit for renters of residential property; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jessica Haak [D] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] |
Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 26 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 65 |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2015-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |