ND HB1362 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 16.1-08.1-03.1 and subsection 1 of section 16.1-08.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to campaign finance.
Title
Campaign finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-02 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |