ND HB1358 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the use of open educational resources in the elementary and secondary school system.
Title
AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the use of open educational resources in the elementary and secondary school system.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Mary Johnson [R] |
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 12 |
2017-02-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |