ND HB1334 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-32-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to registration requirements for sexual offenders; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Registration requirements for sexual offenders; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Meier [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] |
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] |
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor 04/14 |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2017-04-10 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1 |
2017-02-09 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-08 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 5 0 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |