ND HB1328 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Signed by Governor 04/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for limitations on the use of an unmanned aerial vehicle for surveillance.
Title
AN ACT to provide for limitations on the use of an unmanned aerial vehicle for surveillance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 74 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | House | Signed by Governor 04/15 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 14 |
2015-04-09 | House | Concurred |
2015-04-02 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 29 nays 17 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 74 nays 19 |
2015-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 0 |
2015-02-09 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |