ND HB1320 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 39-12-02 and 39-12-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a uniform truck permitting system for oversized or overweight vehicles and local authority to limit use of vehicles on highways; and to provide a penalty.
Title
A uniform truck permitting system for oversized or overweight vehicles and local authority to limit use of vehicles on highways; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |