ND HB1310 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 62.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a pilot program to allow the carrying of a concealed firearm on school property by qualified individuals; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exception to the prohibition against possessing a firearm at a public gathering; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
An exception to the prohibition against possessing a firearm at a public gathering; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19 |
2017-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |