ND HB1310 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 37-14-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility of county veterans' service officers to be appointed as conservators.
Title
Eligibility of county veterans' service officers to be appointed as conservators.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Rep. Ron Guggisberg [D] |
Sen. Ron Carlisle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2013-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |