ND HB1307 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 21-03-07, sections 40-22-01, 40-22-05, 40-22-09, 40-22-15, 40-22-17, 40-23-07, 40-23-11, 40-23-15, 40-23-19, 40-23.1-09, 40-23.1-13, and 40-26-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to special assessments.
Title
Special assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 74 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |