ND HB1302 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 26.1-39-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to property and casualty insurance covered loss.
Title
Property and casualty insurance covered loss.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Schobinger [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. James Kasper [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2017-03-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 5 |
2017-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |