ND HB1301 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 23-52 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting medical gender transitioning procedures on a minor; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Prohibiting medical gender transitioning procedures on a minor; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Prichard [R] | Rep. Scott Dyk [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] | Rep. Bill Tveit [R] |
Rep. Lori VanWinkle [R] | Sen. Keith Boehm [R] | Sen. Mike Dwyer [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] |
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 29 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 62 |
2023-02-16 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 8 6 0 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 11:19 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Human Services |