ND HB1301 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 54-52.4-02, 54-52.4-03, 54-52.4-04, and 54-52.4-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to state employee family sick leave and family leave.
Title
State employee family sick leave and family leave.
Sponsors
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Jessica Haak [D] | Rep. Richard Holman [D] | Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] |
Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 34 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-02 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 34 nays 57 |
2015-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 4 2 |
2015-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |