ND HB1301 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Nodland A BILL for an Act to create and enact sections 39-05-35 and 47-10-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the conversion of manufactured homes to real property and the affixation of manufactured homes to real property and the conveyance and encumbrance of manufactured homes as real property; and to amend and reenact sections 11-18-02.2, 35-01-05.1, 39-05-01, 39-05-02.2, 39-05-09, 39-05-09.2, 39-05-19, 39-05-20, 39-05-22, 47-01-03, 57-02-04, and 57-55-01 and subsection 2 of section 57-55-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to manufactured homes.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Nodland A BILL for an Act to create and enact sections 39-05-35 and 47-10-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the conversion of manufactured homes to real property and the affixation of manufactured homes to real property and the conveyance and encumbrance of manufactured homes as real property; and to amend and reenact sections 11-18-02.2, 35-01-05.1, 39-05-01, 39-05-02.2, 39-05-09, 39-05-09.2, 39-05-19, 39-05-20, 39-05-22, 47-01-03, 57-02-04, and 57-55-01 and subsection 2 of section 57-55-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to manufactured homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-24 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-21 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-16 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-04-16 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-15 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House accede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Nodland Andrist Horne | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Nottestad Ruby Gruchalla | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-01 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-03-24 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-23 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-18 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-28 | Received from House | |
2009-01-27 | Second reading, passed, yeas 094 nays 000 | |
2009-01-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1301.html |