ND HB1294 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Signed by Governor 04/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 11-19.1-15, subsections 9 and 18 of section 23-02.1-01, sections 23-02.1-08, 23-02.1-21, and 23-02.1-22, subsection 2 of section 23-02.1-32, sections 23-06-02, 23-06-03, 23-06-04, 23-06-05, 23-06-06, 23-06-07, 23-06-08, 23-06-09, 23-06-10, 23-06-11, 23-06-12, 23-06-13, and 23-06-26, subsection 8 of section 23-06.6-13, section 30.1-28-06, subsection 4 of section 43-10-01, and sections 43-10-15.4, 43-10-21, and 43-10.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to transportation and disposition upon death; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Transportation and disposition upon death; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Vernon Laning [R] |
Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | House | Signed by Governor 04/14 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 1 |
2017-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2017-01-31 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-30 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 4 3 |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |