ND HB1285 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-31 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create an enact a new section to chapter 57-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an optional residential property tax freeze for owners who are disabled or age sixty-five or older; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An optional residential property tax freeze for owners who are disabled or age sixty-five or older; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 70 |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |