ND HB1284 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 24-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the placement of rumble strips on public roads.
Title
The placement of rumble strips on public roads.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Sen. Robert Erbele [R] |
Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 60 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |