ND HB1281 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the assessment of institutions of higher education; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The assessment of institutions of higher education; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2013-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-18 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-25 | House | Emergency clause failed |
2013-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 60 nays 33 |
2013-02-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 1 |
2013-02-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |