ND HB1281 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-36 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to individual accident and health insurance coverage.
Title
Individual accident and health insurance coverage.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-14 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 89 | |
2011-02-09 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1281.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0130-01000.pdf |