ND HB1278 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 54-17.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the North Dakota outdoor heritage fund; to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 57-51-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the oil and gas gross production tax; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
The oil and gas gross production tax; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 33 nays 12 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment failed |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Amendment proposed on floor |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 0 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 48 nays 44 |
2013-02-22 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 9 3 |
2013-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 0 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |