ND HB1274 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 23-01-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to electronic drug prior authorization.
Title
Electronic drug prior authorization.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Philip Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 |
2013-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |