ND HB1272 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 19-24.1-01, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-03, section 19-24.1-11, and subsection 4 of section 19-24.1-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to medical marijuana.
Title
Medical marijuana.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 5 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 88 |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |