ND HB1272 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 47-16-07.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reasonable accommodations for service animals in rental dwelling units; to amend and reenact section 47-16-07.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to disability documentation for service or assistance animals in a rental dwelling; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Disability documentation for service or assistance animals in a rental dwelling; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Christopher Olson [R] | Sen. Howard Anderson [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 2 |
2017-04-06 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-30 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2017-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |