ND HB1271 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 65
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15-39.1-19.1 and 15-39.1-19.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to retired teachers returning to employment.
Title
Retired teachers returning to employment.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Dori Hauck [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 27 N: 65 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 27 nays 65 |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 04:46 |
2023-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |