ND HB1237 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-03 and a new subsection to section 20.1-03-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a nonresident senior citizen's small game hunting license and fee; and to amend and reenact sections 20.1-03-07 and 20.1-03-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to nonresident hunting licenses.
Title
Nonresident hunting licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-04 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87 | |
2011-02-02 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 2 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/bill-actions/ba1237.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/62-2011/documents/11-0460-01000.pdf |