ND HB1237 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on April 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Lyson, Robinson A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to allowing correctional officers to carry weapons in certain circumstances; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Lyson, Robinson A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to allowing correctional officers to carry weapons in certain circumstances; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Curt Hofstad [R] | Rep. Shirley Meyer [D] | Rep. Nelson [?] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Second reading passed, y 090 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-14 | Concurred | |
2009-04-02 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-02 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-02 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-05 | Received from House | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading passed, y 093 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-01-30 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-29 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1237.html |