ND HB1233 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 57-38-01.21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for charitable contributions to a qualified endowment or a qualified nonprofit organization; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An income tax credit for charitable contributions to a qualified endowment or a qualified nonprofit organization; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Mary Johnson [R] |
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 73 |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |