ND HB1224 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales and use tax exemption for purchases made by a contractor, subcontractor, or builder on behalf of an exempt entity; to amend and reenact section 57-40.2-03.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to use tax on contractors; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Use tax on contractors; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 13 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 13 nays 77 |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |