ND HB1220 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Signed by Governor 03/25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 15-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exemptions from open meetings requirements for the state board of higher education; and to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 15-10-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exemptions from open meetings requirements for the state board of higher education.
Title
Exemptions from open meetings requirements for the state board of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Sanford [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Bob Martinson [R] |
Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Greg Stemen [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | House | Signed by Governor 03/25 |
2021-03-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-18 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 6 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |