ND HB1216 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of school district enrollment determinations for purposes of the elementary and secondary education funding formula.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of school district enrollment determinations for purposes of the elementary and secondary education funding formula.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 42 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:05 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2015-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 1 1 |
2015-02-05 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2015-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |