ND HB1215 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 23-09.3-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of basic care facility.
Title
The definition of basic care facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-21 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |