ND HB1211 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 57-02-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the homestead property tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The homestead property tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. David Richter [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Jim Grueneich [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] |
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Jeffery Magrum [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:43 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2023-02-21 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 2 |
2023-02-20 | House | Committee Hearing 05:28 |
2023-02-15 | House | Committee Hearing 04:00 |
2023-02-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted |
2023-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |