ND HB1200 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 15-10-12.1 and 48-01.2-25 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the approval of higher education campus improvements financed by donations, gifts, grants, and bequests and the approval of a change or expansion of a public improvement project.
Title
The approval of higher education campus improvements financed by donations, gifts, grants, and bequests and the approval of a change or expansion of a public improvement project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2013-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned to House |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 18 |
2013-02-12 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 3 4 |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |