ND HB1194 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public hearings relating to property tax increases.
Title
Public hearings relating to property tax increases.
Sponsors
Rep. Wesley Belter [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Tom Fischer [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] |
Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/27 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Governor 04/27 | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-22 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-22 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-21 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Conference committee appointed Cook Miller Dotzenrod | |
2011-04-18 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-06 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 | |
2011-03-21 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-23 | Reconsidered | |
2011-02-22 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 46 nays 47 | |
2011-02-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |