ND HB1189 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 54-44.7-03 and section 54-44.7-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to procurement procedures and exceptions to bidding thresholds for state building projects.
Title
Procurement procedures and exceptions to bidding thresholds for state building projects.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2017-01-19 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |