ND HB1185 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 006 nays 041
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 006 nays 041
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Lyson, Schneider A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to human trafficking; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Lyson, Schneider A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 12.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to human trafficking; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 006 nays 041 | |
2009-03-17 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-25 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-18 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-01-27 | Received from House | |
2009-01-26 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000 | |
2009-01-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 02:15 | |
2009-01-08 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1185.html |