ND HB1181 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 17-04-01, 17-04-03, and 17-04-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to termination of wind option agreements, wind easements, and wind energy leases.
Title
Termination of wind option agreements, wind easements, and wind energy leases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1 |
2017-04-05 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-21 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2017-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1 |
2017-01-20 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |