ND HB1158 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-04-10.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the fee for personalized motor vehicle number plates; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The fee for personalized motor vehicle number plates; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 75 |
2017-01-16 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-13 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |