ND HB1148 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 5 and 8 of section 40-63-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to renaissance fund organization restrictions for smaller cities.
Title
Renaissance fund organization restrictions for smaller cities.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Rep. Rae Kelsch [R] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 85 | |
2011-01-31 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-28 | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 3 2 | |
2011-01-17 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2011-01-05 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |