ND HB1146 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections 5 and 8 of section 5-01-01 and sections 5-01-16 and 5-02-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to direct shipment of alcoholic beverages from out of state to a retail licensee; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Direct shipment of alcoholic beverages from out of state to a retail licensee; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 16 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 76 |
2017-01-25 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2017-01-23 | House | Rereferred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2017-01-10 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |