ND HB1145 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 29-04-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prosecution for gross sexual imposition; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Prosecution for gross sexual imposition; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-04 | House | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30 |
2023-03-30 | House | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2023-03-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-22 | House | Returned to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:05 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Received from House |
2023-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2023-01-26 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-25 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 2 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:18 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-01-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |