ND HB1145 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-10-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to political subdivision reports in lieu of audits.
Title
Political subdivision reports in lieu of audits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11 | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by Governor 04/08 | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-24 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-21 | Returned to House | |
2011-03-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-03-10 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Received from House | |
2011-01-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 | |
2011-01-14 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 | |
2011-01-14 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-05 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |