ND HB1138 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 85
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-04-10.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to personalized plates; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Personalized plates; to provide for application; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 8 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-17 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 85 |
2017-01-13 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |