ND HB1138 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Signed by Governor 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 12-63-09 and 12-63-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to peace officer licenses; and to repeal section 12-63-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to peace officer licenses.
Title
Peace officer licenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] | Sen. Ron Carlisle [R] |
Sen. Stanley Lyson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | House | Signed by Governor 04/29 |
2013-04-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate recede) |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Armstrong Lyson Grabinger |
2013-04-17 | House | Appoint Rep. Delmore to replace Rep. Karls on conference committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee appointed K. Koppelman Boehning Karls |
2013-04-16 | House | Refused to concur |
2013-04-04 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2013-01-21 | House | Committee Hearing 10:20 |
2013-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |