ND HB1124 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 60-02.1-28 and 60-04-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a public warehouse or grain buyer licensee insolvency.
Title
A public warehouse or grain buyer licensee insolvency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1 |
2017-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2017-01-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |