ND HB1123 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the secretary of state for the procurement and implementation of a voting system to be utilized statewide; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the secretary of state for the procurement and implementation of a voting system to be utilized statewide; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 78 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 18 1 2 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |