ND HB1113 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subdivision to subsection 2 of section 12-60-24 and sections 43-18-12.1, 43-18.1-04.1, and 43-18.2-07.1, relating to criminal history record checks for plumbers, water conditioning contractors and installers, and sewer and water installers; and to amend and reenact section 43-18-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to temporary licenses for plumbers pending criminal history record checks.
Title
Temporary licenses for plumbers pending criminal history record checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 42 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 42 nays 49 |
2017-01-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2 |
2017-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |