ND HB1087 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 5-01-04 and 5-01-14 and subsection 5 of section 5-01-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to obsolete references to the federal bureau of alcohol, tobacco, firearms and explosives for alcoholic beverage regulation purposes and monthly sales report filing requirements for microbrew pubs; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 5-01-04 and 5-01-14 and subsection 5 of section 5-01-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to obsolete references to the federal bureau of alcohol, tobacco, firearms and explosives for alcoholic beverage regulation purposes and monthly sales report filing requirements for microbrew pubs; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-24 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-16 | Returned to House | |
2009-03-13 | Second reading, passed, yeas 044 nays 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 007 n 000 | |
2009-03-11 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-01-19 | Received from House | |
2009-01-16 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-13 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1087.html |